OH HB500 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-14)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 349.03, 505.01, 505.04, 505.482, 507.11, 513.07, 513.071, 517.30, 519.04, 519.07, 519.12, 519.13, 519.15, 1509.07, 3375.121, 3501.021, 3709.03, 5541.04, 5553.04, 5705.121, 5705.19, 5709.73, and 5709.75 and to repeal sections 711.25, 711.26, and 711.27 of the Revised Code, to amend Sections 221.20 and 361.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly and Section 221.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to make various changes to township law, to make an appropriation for Pike County capital case litigation, and to make an appropriation for Death Benefit Fund beneficiaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change township law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13SenatePassed
2018-12-13SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2018-12-12SenateRe-referred: Finance
2018-12-04SenateReported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2018-09-25SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2018-07-05SenateIntroduced
2018-06-27HousePassed
2018-05-29HouseReported - Substitute: State and Local Government
2018-02-20HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1509Amended CodeCitation Text
150907Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
303Amended CodeCitation Text
30321Amended CodeCitation Text
349Amended CodeCitation Text
34903Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3375Amended CodeCitation Text
3375121Amended CodeCitation Text
35Amended CodeCitation Text
3501Amended CodeCitation Text
3501021Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3709Amended CodeCitation Text
370903Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
503New CodeSee Bill Text
50358New CodeSee Bill Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
50501Amended CodeCitation Text
50504Amended CodeCitation Text
50538Amended CodeCitation Text
505482Amended CodeCitation Text
507Amended CodeCitation Text
50711Amended CodeCitation Text
513Amended CodeCitation Text
51307Amended CodeCitation Text
513071Amended CodeCitation Text
517Amended CodeCitation Text
51730Amended CodeCitation Text
519Amended CodeCitation Text
51904Amended CodeCitation Text
51907Amended CodeCitation Text
51912Amended CodeCitation Text
51913Amended CodeCitation Text
51915Amended CodeCitation Text
51921Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5541Amended CodeCitation Text
554104Amended CodeCitation Text
5553Amended CodeCitation Text
555304Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
5705121Amended CodeCitation Text
570519Amended CodeCitation Text
5709Amended CodeCitation Text
570973Amended CodeCitation Text
570975Amended CodeCitation Text
7Repealed CodeCitation Text
711Repealed CodeCitation Text
71125Repealed CodeCitation Text
71126Repealed CodeCitation Text
71127Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-HB-500
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb500/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb500/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb500/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb500/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb500/RCS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb500/RRS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb500/PS/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-HB-500

Bill Comments

feedback