OH HB5 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-18)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4758.20, 4758.42, and 4758.61 of the Revised Code to modify the requirements that may be met for licensure as a chemical dependency counselor II and to modify the professionals who may supervise certain individuals providing prevention services, and to amend the version of section 4758.20 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect October 9, 2021, to continue the change on and after that date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify chemical dependency counselor licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-02-24SenateIntroduced
2021-02-25HousePassed - Amended
2021-02-23HouseReported: Health
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
475820Amended CodeCitation Text
475842Amended CodeCitation Text
475861Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-5
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb5/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb5/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb5/PH/02?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15578&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15710&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15723&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15736&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15749&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15819&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15809&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-5

Bill Comments

feedback