OH HB5 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-15)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-17 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-17 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5747.01 and to enact sections 120.61, 120.62, 120.63, 120.64, 120.65, 120.66, 120.67, and 120.68 of the Revised Code to establish the Ohio Public Defender State Loan Repayment Program and to make an appropriation.
Title
Establish Ohio Public Defender State Loan Repayment Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-06-20 | House | Passed |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-referred: Finance |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-referred - Amended: Rules and Reference |
2019-05-22 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Education
Employment
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Taxation
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Education
Employment
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 20 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 20 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 20 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 20 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 20 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 20 | 66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 20 | 67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 20 | 68 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |