OH HB494 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-11)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-11)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 133.01, 715.70, 715.71, 715.74, 4301.80, 4303.181, 4504.08, 4504.09, 5747.24, 5747.331, and 5751.52, to enact sections 4504.22 and 5595.01 to 5595.13 of the Revised Code, to amend Section 9 of Am. Sub. H.B. 386 of the 129th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to amend Section 363.487 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly, and to amend Section 363.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to authorize counties to undertake regional transportation improvement projects funded by the issuance of securities and by revenue pledges from the state and political subdivisions and taxing districts located within the cooperating counties, to increase the amount of time a person may spend in Ohio before being presumed to be a resident for state income tax purposes, to authorize taxpayers eligible to claim a tax credit for qualified research and development loan payments to claim the credit, retroactive to taxable years beginning in 2008, against the income tax, to authorize municipal corporations and townships to create a community entertainment district as part of a joint economic development district contract, to make changes to video lottery terminal facilities, and to make an appropriation.
Title
, to amend Section 9 of Am. Sub. H.B. 386 of the 129th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to amend Section 363.487 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly, and to amend Section 363.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to authorize counties to undertake regional transportation improvement projects funded by the issuance of securities and by revenue pledges from the state and political subdivisions and taxing districts located within the cooperating counties, to increase the amount of time a person may spend in Ohio before being presumed to be a resident for state income tax purposes, to authorize taxpayers eligible to claim a tax credit for qualified research and development loan payments to claim the credit, retroactive to taxable years beginning in 2008, against the income tax, to authorize municipal corporations and townships to create a community entertainment district as part of a joint economic development district contract, to make changes to video lottery terminal facilities, and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-05-29 | To Ways & Means | |
2014-05-29 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-03-18 | To State and Local Government | |
2014-03-18 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
43 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 01 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 03 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 04 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 04 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 04 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 95 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 95 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 95 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 51 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 15 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 15 | 71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 15 | 74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |