OH HB490 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-37)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-37)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 124.23, 124.26, 149.01, 317.24, 3319.085, 3333.31, 3737.881, 3781.10, 5321.04, 5902.02, 5903.10, 5903.11, 5911.07, 5923.12, 5924.01, 5924.02, 5924.03, 5924.06, 5924.07, 5924.08, 5924.09, 5924.10, 5924.11, 5924.13, 5924.14, 5924.15, 5924.16, 5924.17, 5924.18, 5924.19, 5924.20, 5924.22, 5924.23, 5924.24, 5924.25, 5924.26, 5924.27, 5924.28, 5924.29, 5924.30, 5924.31, 5924.32, 5924.33, 5924.34, 5924.35, 5924.36, 5924.37, 5924.38, 5924.39, 5924.41, 5924.42, 5924.43, 5924.44, 5924.45, 5924.46, 5924.47, 5924.48, 5924.49, 5924.50, 5924.51, 5924.52, 5924.54, 5924.56, 5924.57, 5924.58, 5924.59, 5924.60, 5924.63, 5924.72, 5924.73, 5924.74, 5924.75, 5924.76, 5924.77, 5924.78, 5924.82, 5924.83, 5924.84, 5924.85, 5924.86, 5924.87, 5924.88, 5924.89, 5924.90, 5924.91, 5924.92, 5924.93, 5924.94, 5924.95, 5924.96, 5924.97, 5924.98, 5924.103, 5924.108, 5924.109, 5924.111, 5924.113, 5924.115, 5924.128, 5924.131, 5924.132, 5924.133, and 5924.146, to enact new sections 5924.21, 5924.61, 5924.62, 5924.64, 5924.65, 5924.66, 5924.70, 5924.71, and 5924.120 and sections 4743.04, 5924.501, 5924.502, 5924.503, 5924.504, 5924.505, 5924.506, 5924.581, 5924.582, 5924.67, 5924.68, 5924.69, 5924.761, and 5924.1121, and to repeal sections 5924.04, 5924.12, 5924.21, 5924.61, 5924.62, 5924.64, 5924.65, 5924.66, 5924.70, 5924.71, 5924.99, 5924.100, 5924.101, 5924.102, 5924.104, 5924.105, 5924.106, 5924.110, 5924.114, 5924.118, 5924.119, 5924.120, 5924.122, 5924.1231, 5924.124, 5924.125, 5924.126, 5924.129, 5924.130, 5924.145, and 5924.147 of the Revised Code to change the law regarding a County Recorder's release of a veteran's record of discharge, to modify the duties of the Director of Veterans Services with respect to publishing information about Veterans Services offices, to modify the composition of the Veterans Advisory Committee, to grant in-state tuition for nonresident spouses and dependents of veterans who served on active duty and are deceased, to allow extra credit to military veterans and reserve component members on state civil service examinations, to provide for the reemployment of nonteaching school employees following military service in accordance with federal law, to extend the period of time within which persons serving in the Ohio National Guard may meet continuing education requirements for occupational licenses and renew their licenses, to require that workers' compensation claims of members of the organized militia be determined in accordance with applicable line of duty regulations, to require landlords to observe the rights of tenants who are service members under federal law, to modify the order of priority in which veterans may participate in job training programs, to permit but not require the use of armories by patriotic and national organizations, to update references in the Revised Code to federal statutes relating to the National Guard, to conform the Ohio Code of Military Justice to the United States Code of Military Justice, and to make other changes to the Ohio Code of Military Justice.
Title
To change the law regarding a County Recorder's release of a veteran's record of discharge, to modify the duties of the Director of Veterans Services with respect to publishing information about Veterans Services offices, to modify the composition of the Veterans Advisory Committee, to grant in-state tuition for nonresident spouses and dependents of veterans who served on active duty and are deceased, to allow extra credit to military veterans and reserve component members on state civil service examinations, to provide for the reemployment of nonteaching school employees following military service in accordance with federal law, to extend the period of time within which persons serving in the Ohio National Guard may meet continuing education requirements for occupational licenses and renew their licenses, to require that workers' compensation claims of members of the organized militia be determined in accordance with applicable line of duty regulations, to require landlords to observe the rights of tenants who are service members under federal law, to modify the order of priority in which veterans may participate in job training programs, to permit but not require the use of armories by patriotic and national organizations, to update references in the Revised Code to federal statutes relating to the National Guard, to conform the Ohio Code of Military Justice to the United States Code of Military Justice, and to make other changes to the Ohio Code of Military Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Effective Date | |
2012-06-26 | Governor' Action | |
2012-07-02 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-06-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-06-12 | Committee Report - A | |
2012-04-25 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-04-24 | Committee Report | |
2012-03-22 | To Veterans Affairs | |
2012-03-22 | Introduced to House |