OH HB49 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-16)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
Pending: Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
Pending: Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3701.83 and 3727.44; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 3727.44 (3727.41); to enact sections 3727.31, 3727.32, 3727.33, 3727.34, 3727.35, 3727.36, 3727.37, 3727.38, 3727.39, and 3727.40; and to repeal sections 3727.42, 3727.43, and 3727.45 of the Revised Code regarding the availability of hospital price information; and to amend the version of section 3701.83 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect on September 30, 2024, to continue the change on and after that date.
Title
Regards availability of hospital price information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-06-27 | House | Passed |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported - Amended: Insurance |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to committee: Insurance |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce : Consumer Finance
Health and Human Services : Health Care
House Insurance Committee
Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Health and Human Services : Health Care
House Insurance Committee
Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 01 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 27 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 27 | 42 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
37 | 27 | 43 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
37 | 27 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 27 | 45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |