OH HB487 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Reported: Local Government and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Reported: Local Government and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3505.13 and 3505.14 of the Revised Code to change the bidding process for contracts for ballot printing, to eliminate the requirement that all contracts for ballots for Ohio elections are rewarded to vendors within the state and printed within the state.
Title
Regards ballot printing and contracts for printing ballots
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Young [R] | Rep. Cindy Abrams [R] | Rep. Sara Carruthers [R] | Rep. Gary Click [R] |
Rep. Mark Fraizer [R] | Rep. Brian Lampton [R] | Rep. Sharon Ray [R] | Rep. Craig Riedel [R] |
Rep. William Seitz [R] | Rep. Andrea White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Reported: Local Government and Elections |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Informally passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported - Amended: Government Oversight |
2021-11-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight |
2021-11-10 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 05 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |