OH HB487 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 133.06, 149.433, 921.06, 3301.079, 3301.0710, 3301.0711, 3301.0712, 3301.0714, 3301.0715, 3301.16, 3302.01, 3302.02, 3302.03, 3302.031, 3302.10, 3310.03, 3310.031, 3310.13, 3310.14, 3310.522, 3311.24, 3311.38, 3311.86, 3313.372, 3313.532, 3313.537, 3313.539, 3313.603, 3313.6013, 3313.6014, 3313.6016, 3313.61, 3313.611, 3313.612, 3313.614, 3313.615, 3313.617, 3313.843, 3313.90, 3313.976, 3314.02, 3314.03, 3314.06, 3314.08, 3314.35, 3314.36, 3317.03, 3318.70, 3319.22, 3319.26, 3319.31, 3324.07, 3325.02, 3325.06, 3325.07, 3325.08, 3325.10, 3326.11, 3326.36, 3328.24, 3328.25, 3331.04, 3333.041, 3333.123, 3333.35, 3333.43, 3333.86, 3345.06, 3345.061, 3365.04, 3365.041, 3365.05, 3365.06, 3365.08, 3365.11, and 3707.511; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 3365.04 (3365.06), 3365.041 (3365.032), 3365.05 (3365.12), 3365.06 (3365.031), and 3365.11 (3365.09); to enact new sections 3313.536, 3365.01, 3365.02, 3365.03, 3365.04, 3365.05, 3365.07, 3365.10, 3365.11, and 3365.15 and sections 3301.078, 3301.163, 3301.28, 3301.947, 3301.948, 3302.035, 3302.036, 3302.15, 3311.241, 3313.21, 3313.212, 3313.6020, 3313.618, 3314.191, 3314.352, 3319.261, 3324.09, 3324.11, 3325.071, 3325.09, 3325.17, 3326.29, 3365.033, 3365.071, 3365.13, and 3707.521; and to repeal sections 3313.536, 3345.062, 3365.01, 3365.02, 3365.021, 3365.022, 3365.03, 3365.07, 3365.09, 3365.10, 3365.12, and 3365.15 of the Revised Code; and to amend Section 263.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly with regard to education provisions for students in grades kindergarten through twelve.
Title
; and to amend Section 263.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly with regard to education provisions for students in grades kindergarten through twelve.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House - Conference report agree to (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 6 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 6 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-16 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-28 | Conference Committee | |
2014-05-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-20 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-04-10 | To Education | |
2014-04-10 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-04-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-03 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-03-18 | To Education | |
2014-03-18 | Introduced to House |