OH HB478 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-7)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Effective 8/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-7)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Effective 8/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1332.23, 4939.01, 4939.02, 4939.03, 4939.031, 4939.035, 4939.038, 4939.0311, 4939.0313, 4939.0315, 4939.0319, 4939.0325, and 4939.08; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 4939.035 (4939.036), 4939.038 (4939.037), 4939.039 (4939.038), 4939.0313 (4939.0312), 4939.0315 (4939.0313), 4939.0317 (4939.0315), 4939.0319 (4939.0316), 4939.0325 (4939.0322), 4939.0327 (4939.0323), and 4939.08 (4939.09); to enact new sections 4939.032, 4939.033, 4939.039, 4939.0317, and 4939.08 and sections 4939.0314 and 4939.0329; and to repeal sections 4939.032, 4939.033, 4939.037, and 4939.0321 of the Revised Code to modify the law regarding wireless service and the placement of small cell wireless facilities in the public way.
Title
Modify law regarding wireless service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | Effective 8/1/18 | |
2018-04-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Public Utilities |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Public Utilities |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2018-01-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 32 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 0311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 0313 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 0315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 0317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 0319 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 032 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 0321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 0325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 0327 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 033 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 035 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 037 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 038 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 039 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 39 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |