OH HB476 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression
Action: 2016-12-08 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 135.143 and 135.35 and to enact section 9.76 of the Revised Code to raise the foreign debt cap from one per cent to two per cent regarding state interim funds and county inactive and public library fund investments and to prohibit a state agency from contracting with a company that is involved in a boycott.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits agencies from contracting with anti-Israel companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-08SenatePassed
2016-12-08HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2016-12-07SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2016-11-29HousePassed - Amended
2016-05-18HouseReported: Government Accountability and Oversight
2016-04-13HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2016-02-24HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
135Amended CodeCitation Text
135143Amended CodeCitation Text
13535Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback