OH HB47 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5715.19 of the Revised Code to increase the time within which property tax complaints must be decided.
Title
Revise time decide property tax complaint;rename Legal Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported - Amended: Ways and Means |
2019-02-13 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 15 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |