OH HB466 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-12 - Effective 10/12/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-12 - Effective 10/12/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5739.01 of the Revised Code to specifically exempt digital advertising services from sales and use tax.
Title
Exempts digital advertising services from sales tax
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-12 | Effective 10/12/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported: Ways and Means |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported: Ways and Means |
2016-02-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |