OH HB464 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-33)
Status: Enrolled on December 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 3727.11, 3727.12, 3727.13, 3727.14, 3727.15, and 4765.401 of the Revised Code to provide for recognition of stroke centers and establishment of protocols for assessment, treatment, and transport to hospitals of stroke patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize stroke centers and establish stroke protocols

Sponsors

Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. George Lang [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Candice Keller [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. John Boccieri [D]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]
Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]

Roll Calls

2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-12SenatePassed
2018-11-28SenateReported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2018-07-10SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced
2018-06-07HousePassed
2018-04-11HouseReported - Substitute: Health
2018-01-24HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37New CodeSee Bill Text
3727New CodeSee Bill Text
372711New CodeSee Bill Text
372712New CodeSee Bill Text
372713New CodeSee Bill Text
372714New CodeSee Bill Text
372715New CodeSee Bill Text
47New CodeSee Bill Text
4765New CodeSee Bill Text
4765051New CodeSee Bill Text
4765401New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback