OH HB463 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-22)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-22)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3333.61, 4715.031, 4715.037, 4715.10, 4715.13, 4715.22, 4715.23, 4715.24, 4715.363, 4715.366, 4715.371, 4715.373, 4715.39, 4715.56, 4715.64, and 4715.66 and to enact sections 3702.96, 3702.961, 3702.962, 3702.963, 3702.964, 3702.965, 3702.966, 3702.967, and 4715.421 of the Revised Code to make changes to the laws governing dental professionals.
Title
To make changes to the laws governing dental professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-06-04 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-06-04 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-02-27 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-02-27 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 33 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 02 | 96 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 961 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 962 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 963 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 964 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 965 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 966 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 967 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 968 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | 969 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 15 | 031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 037 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 363 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 366 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 371 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 373 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 421 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |