OH HB462 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 124.152, 2901.01, and 2929.18 and to enact sections 2917.321 and 5503.031 of the Revised Code to prohibit swatting, to add swatting to the definition of an offense of violence, and to make changes regarding exempt employee pay ranges and pay ranges for certain State Highway Patrol officers.
Title
Prohibit swatting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-11-30 | House | Passed |
2022-11-30 | House | Reported - Amended: Criminal Justice |
2021-10-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Utilities : Telecommunications
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Utilities : Telecommunications
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 24 | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 17 | 321 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 29 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 03 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |