OH HB461 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2317.02, 3105.18, and 3105.64 and to enact sections 3105.41, 3105.42, 3105.43, 3105.44, 3105.45, 3105.46, 3105.47, 3105.48, 3105.49, 3105.50, 3105.51, 3105.52, 3105.53, and 3105.54 of the Revised Code to establish a statutory collaborative family law process to aid in the resolution of family law disputes, to clarify when an order of spousal support may be modified, and to clarify the circumstances under which a client's statements may compel an attorney to testify regarding attorney-client communications.
Title
To establish a statutory collaborative family law process to aid in the resolution of family law disputes, to clarify when an order of spousal support may be modified, and to clarify the circumstances under which a client's statements may compel an attorney to testify regarding attorney-client communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2012-11-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-11-28 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-29 | To Judiciary | |
2012-05-29 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-05-23 | Committee Report | |
2012-02-22 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 17 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
31 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
31 | 05 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 05 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 05 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |