OH HB46 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 135.35 of the Revised Code to modify the qualifications regarding notes eligible for investment of county inactive moneys.
Title
Modify qualifications for investing county and library money
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-06-07 | House | Passed |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported - Amended: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development |
2017-02-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 35 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |