OH HB458 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 153.64, 3781.25, 3781.26, 3781.27, 3781.28, 3781.29, 3781.30, 3781.31, and 3781.32 and to enact sections 3781.261 and 3781.271 of the Revised Code to modify the call before you dig notification system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To modify the call before you dig notification system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-27 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-12 Concurrence
2012-12-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-12 Committee Report
2012-12-06 To Energy & Public Utilities
2012-12-06 Introduced to Senate
2012-12-05 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-12-05 Committee Report - S
2012-02-15 To Public Utilities
2012-02-15 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
153Amended CodeCitation Text
15364Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3781Amended CodeCitation Text
378125Amended CodeCitation Text
378126Amended CodeCitation Text
3781261New CodeSee Bill Text
378127Amended CodeCitation Text
3781271New CodeSee Bill Text
378128Amended CodeCitation Text
378129Amended CodeCitation Text
378130Amended CodeCitation Text
378131Amended CodeCitation Text
378132Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback