OH HB456 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-13 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-13 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2925.14 of the Revised Code to decriminalize fentanyl drug testing strips.
Title
Decriminalize fentanyl drug testing strips
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-11-30 | House | Passed |
2022-11-30 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2021-10-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2021-10-19 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 25 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |