OH HB453 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Reported: Government Oversight and Reform
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Reported: Government Oversight and Reform
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 339.062 of the Revised Code to require that all rights to and interests in discoveries or inventions made by, or patents issued to, employees using charter county hospital facilities or funding are the property of that charter county hospital.
Title
Declare inventions at county hospitals to be hospital property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2018-01-16 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-12-19 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Health Care
State and Local Government : Ethics
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Ethics
State and Local Government : Local Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
3 | 39 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 39 | 062 | New Code | See Bill Text |