OH HB451 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1337.13, 1337.17, 2133.05, 2133.08, 2133.09, and 2133.12 of the Revised Code to provide that an individual's statutory priority to decide whether or not to withhold or withdraw life-sustaining treatment for the individual's relative is forfeited if the individual is the subject of a temporary protection order or civil protection order and the relative is the alleged victim or if the individual and the relative are married and the parties to a divorce, dissolution, legal separation, or annulment proceeding, to void any objections to a living will made by a person whose statutory priority would be so forfeited, and to provide that an attorney in fact under a durable power of attorney for health care is competent to make decisions pertaining to life-sustaining treatment, nutrition, or hydration, only if the attorney in fact is not subject to a temporary protection order or civil protection order in which the principal is the alleged victim.
Title
Prohibits certain persons from making life support decisions
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Boose [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Passed |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported - Amended: Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 37 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 37 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 33 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 33 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 33 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 33 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |