OH HB441 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4765.16 and to enact sections 109.749 and 4765.162 of the Revised Code to require peace officers and emergency medical service personnel to undergo training on identifying and interacting with individuals with dementia.
Title
Require police/emergency personnel-take training about dementia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-08 | House | Passed |
2020-11-12 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2019-12-11 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-12-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services : Aging
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Public Safety
Health and Human Services : Aging
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 09 | 749 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 65 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 65 | 162 | New Code | See Bill Text |