OH HB44 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-08 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2903.13 and 2929.13 of the Revised Code to increase the penalties for assault if the victim is acting as a sports official or the assault is committed in retaliation for the victim's actions as a sports official.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase assault penalties in certain circumstances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-08SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-06-25HousePassed
2021-06-24HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
290313Amended CodeCitation Text
292913Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-44
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb44/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb44/RH/01/hb44_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb44/PH/02/hb44_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15975&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16178&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17203&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17206&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17255&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17629&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-44

Bill Comments

feedback