OH HB44 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-35)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective 5/3/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.261 of the Revised Code to designate May 24 as First Responders' Appreciation Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate an appreciation day

Sponsors

Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. John Barnes [D]
Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]
Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]
Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]
Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Michael Skindell [D]
Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Effective 5/3/18
2018-01-17SenatePassed
2017-12-05SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-04-26SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-03-30SenateIntroduced
2017-03-29HousePassed
2017-03-22HouseReported: State and Local Government
2017-02-14HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback