OH HB44 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-15)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact section 3701.048 of the Revised Code to require the Director of Health to develop protocols regarding the authority to administer, deliver, distribute, or dispense drugs during certain public health emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require the Director of Health to develop protocols regarding the authority to administer, deliver, distribute, or dispense drugs during certain public health emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-10 Effective Date
2014-03-11 Governor' Action
2014-03-18 End of 10-day period
2014-03-06 Sent to Governor
2014-02-26 Concurrence
2014-02-26 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2014-01-29 Committee Report - A
2013-06-20 To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
2013-06-20 Introduced to Senate
2013-06-19 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2013-06-12 Committee Report - S
2013-02-12 To Health and Aging
2013-02-12 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37New CodeSee Bill Text
3701New CodeSee Bill Text
3701048New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback