OH HB436 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3310.03, 3310.522, 3313.976, 3314.03, 3323.11, 3326.11, and 3328.24; to enact new section 3323.25 and sections 3319.077, 3319.078, and 3323.251; and to repeal section 3323.25 of the Revised Code with regard to screening and intervention for children with dyslexia and to modify achievement assessment requirements for students receiving state scholarships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards screening and intervention for children with dyslexia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12 Effective 4/12/21
2020-12-22HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-12-17SenatePassed
2020-12-17SenateReported - Substitute: Education
2020-06-30SenateRefer to Committee: Education
2020-06-12SenateIntroduced
2020-06-10HousePassed
2020-06-10HouseReported: Health
2019-12-10HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-12-04HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
331003Amended CodeCitation Text
3310522Amended CodeCitation Text
3313976Amended CodeCitation Text
3314Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
3323Amended CodeCitation Text
332311Amended CodeCitation Text
332325Repealed CodeCitation Text
3326Amended CodeCitation Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text
3328Amended CodeCitation Text
332824Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback