OH HB436 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4510.13 of the Revised Code to authorize a judge that grants limited driving privileges to a second-time OVI offender to order the termination of the mandatory immobilization order.
Title
Allows court to end vehicle immobilization in certain OVI cases
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cupp [R] | Rep. John Rogers [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Manually Generate Message Element |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported: Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 10 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |