OH HB435 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Re-referred: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 4123.01 and to enact sections 3792.05, 3792.06, 3792.07, 3792.08, 4123.87, and 4765.60 of the Revised Code to address COVID-19 vaccine requirements for employees and students; to extend certain timelines for qualified civil immunity and expand immunity to include hearing aid dealers and hearing aid fitters; to authorize emergency medical technicians to administer COVID-19 tests; to expressly cover COVID-19 vaccine injuries under the workers' compensation system; and to repeal sections 3792.05, 3792.06, 3792.07, and 3792.08 of the Revised Code on June 30, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declare intent to enact legislation regarding vaccines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2021-09-29HouseReported - Substitute: Health
2021-09-28HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2021-09-27HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
379205New CodeSee Bill Text
379206New CodeSee Bill Text
379207New CodeSee Bill Text
379208New CodeSee Bill Text
412301Amended CodeCitation Text
412387New CodeSee Bill Text
476560New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-435
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb435/IN/00/hb435_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb435/RH/01/hb435_01_RH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17449&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17453&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17465&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17467&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17474&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17472&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-435

Bill Comments

feedback