OH HB414 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend section 102.02 and to enact sections 904.01 to 904.09 of the Revised Code to establish requirements and responsibilities of the Ohio Livestock Care Standards Board and the Director of Agriculture in administering and enforcing the rules adopted by the Board that govern the care and well-being of livestock in this state, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish requirements and responsibilities of the Ohio Livestock Care Standards Board and the Director of Agriculture in administering and enforcing the rules adopted by the Board that govern the care and well-being of livestock in this state, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-31 Effective Date
2010-03-31 Governor' Action
2010-04-09 End of 10-day period
2010-03-29 Sent to Governor
2010-03-24 Concurrence
2010-03-24 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-03-24 Committee Report - S
2010-03-11 To Agriculture
2010-03-11 Introduced to Senate
2010-03-10 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2010-03-03 Committee Report - S
2010-01-19 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2010-01-19 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
102Amended CodeCitation Text
10202Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
904New CodeSee Bill Text
90401New CodeSee Bill Text
90402New CodeSee Bill Text
90403New CodeSee Bill Text
90404New CodeSee Bill Text
90405New CodeSee Bill Text
90406New CodeSee Bill Text
90407New CodeSee Bill Text
90408New CodeSee Bill Text
923Amended CodeCitation Text
92344Amended CodeCitation Text
92346Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback