OH HB414 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 102.02 and to enact sections 904.01 to 904.09 of the Revised Code to establish requirements and responsibilities of the Ohio Livestock Care Standards Board and the Director of Agriculture in administering and enforcing the rules adopted by the Board that govern the care and well-being of livestock in this state, and to declare an emergency.
Title
To establish requirements and responsibilities of the Ohio Livestock Care Standards Board and the Director of Agriculture in administering and enforcing the rules adopted by the Board that govern the care and well-being of livestock in this state, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Effective Date | |
2010-03-31 | Governor' Action | |
2010-04-09 | End of 10-day period | |
2010-03-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-24 | Concurrence | |
2010-03-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-03-11 | To Agriculture | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-03-03 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-01-19 | To Agriculture & Natural Resources | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 02 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 04 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 04 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 04 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 04 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 04 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 04 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 04 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 04 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 23 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 23 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |