OH HB412 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Effective 3/24/21 - Certain provisions effective December 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Effective 3/24/21 - Certain provisions effective December 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3750.04 and to enact sections 103.60 and 3701.051 of the Revised Code to establish the Rare Disease Advisory Council, to authorize the Emergency Response Commission to exempt a local emergency planning committee from conducting certain annual exercises, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Establish Rare Disease Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Effective 3/24/21 - Certain provisions effective December 21, 2020 | |
2020-12-08 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-12-03 | House | Amendments laid over under the rule |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported - Amended: Health |
2019-11-18 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2019-11-13 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Public Health
State and Local Government : State Government
Health and Human Services : Public Health
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 03 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 01 | 051 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 50 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |