OH HB411 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2305.02, 2743.48, 2929.01, 2967.141, and 2969.21 of the Revised Code to modify the state's wrongful imprisonment law and to modify the purpose of violation sanction centers.
Title
Modify wrongful imprisonment law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-11-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 05 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
27 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
27 | 43 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 67 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 67 | 141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 69 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |