OH HB41 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3503.24, 3505.181, 3505.183, 3505.20, 3505.21, 3509.01, 3509.06, 3511.04, and 3511.11 and to enact section 3509.051 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 2 and 5 of Am. Sub. S.B. 135 of the 132nd General Assembly to modify the law concerning challenges to voter registrations, the appointment of observers, and absent voting, and to change the manner in which counties may use reimbursements for voting machine acquisitions.
Title
Modify voting procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-06-21 | House | Passed |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-02-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
35 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 03 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 05 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 09 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 09 | 051 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 09 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 11 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 11 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |