OH HB406 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 149.43 and 149.45 of the Revised Code to include forensic mental health providers, mental health evaluation providers, and regional psychiatric hospital employees as individuals whose residential and familial information is exempt from disclosure under the Public Records Law, and whose addresses public offices, upon request, must redact from records available to the general public on the internet.
Title
Exempt forensic and mental health examiners from public records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-20 | House | Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-11-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services
State and Local Government : Public Records
Health and Human Services
State and Local Government : Public Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 49 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |