OH HB405 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-26)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Effective 3/31/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-26)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Effective 3/31/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 135.63, 135.78, 1733.04, and 1733.24 and to enact sections 135.79, 135.791, 135.792, 135.793, 135.794, 135.795, and 135.796 of the Revised Code to create the adoption linked deposit program.
Title
Create adoption linked deposit program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Effective 3/31/21 | |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-05-13 | House | Passed |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2019-11-18 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2019-11-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce : Consumer Finance
Commerce : Financial Institutions
Juvenile and Family Law : Adoption
State and Local Government : State Government
Commerce : Financial Institutions
Juvenile and Family Law : Adoption
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 35 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 35 | 78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 35 | 79 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 791 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 792 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 793 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 794 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 795 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 35 | 796 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 33 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 33 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |