OH HB405 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-24)
Status: Passed on January 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Effective 1/22/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2923.31 and to enact section 2913.30 of the Revised Code to create the offense of counterfeiting and to include counterfeiting within the definition of "corrupt activity" under the Corrupt Activities Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make counterfeiting a corrupt activity crime

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]
Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Nino Vitale [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Sen. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]

Roll Calls

2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22 Effective 1/22/19
2018-09-25SenatePassed
2018-06-06SenateReported: Judiciary
2018-04-11SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2018-03-26SenateIntroduced
2018-03-21HousePassed
2018-01-24HouseReported - Amended: Criminal Justice
2017-11-28HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2913New CodeSee Bill Text
291330New CodeSee Bill Text
2923Amended CodeCitation Text
292331Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback