OH HB4 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-14)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2925.03 and 2925.11 of the Revised Code to provide that in determining the amount of cocaine for trafficking and possession offenses, it also includes a compound, mixture, preparation, or substance containing cocaine, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Prescribe how cocaine is to be measured for offense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported - Amended: Criminal Justice |
2017-02-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 25 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |