OH HB397 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - To Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - To Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4549.02 and 4549.021 of the Revised Code to increase the penalty for violations of failure to stop after an accident and failure to stop after a nonpublic road accident that result in the death of a person or serious physical harm to a person and to name this act Brandon's Law.
Title
To increase the penalty for violations of failure to stop after an accident and failure to stop after a nonpublic road accident that result in the death of a person or serious physical harm to a person and to name this act Brandon's Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | To Criminal Justice | |
2014-04-07 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-04-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-13 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-12-23 | To Judiciary | |
2013-12-23 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 49 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 49 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |