OH HB390 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-22)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2151.34, 2743.191, 2903.214, 2907.231, 2919.27, and 2933.82 and to enact section 2743.671 of the Revised Code to require governmental evidence-retention entities to secure and test sexual assault examination kits in relation to an investigation or prosecution of trafficking in persons, to prohibit engaging in prostitution with a person with a developmental disability, to provide funds for funeral expenses to victims of crime, and to eliminate the authorization in certain circumstances for the use of Reparations Fund money to pay for electronic monitoring.
Title
Require sex assault exam kits for trafficking in persons cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2021-09-21 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2021-08-18 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 51 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 43 | 191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 43 | 671 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 03 | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 07 | 231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 33 | 82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |