OH HB390 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16 - Certain provisions effective on other dates.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 103.71, 103.74, 120.33, 122.171, 122.85, 124.152, 124.181, 124.382, 126.32, 127.19, 181.22, 301.28, 305.31, 305.42, 323.47, 323.73, 1303.38, 2303.26, 2327.01, 2327.02, 2327.04, 2329.01, 2329.151, 2329.17, 2329.18, 2329.19, 2329.20, 2329.21, 2329.26, 2329.271, 2329.28, 2329.30, 2329.31, 2329.33, 2329.34, 2329.39, 2329.45, 2329.52, 2329.56, 2909.07, 2941.51, 3316.042, 3375.404, 3702.511, 4141.25, 4741.11, 5145.162, 5302.01, 5537.02, 5721.371, 5721.39, 5739.01, 5739.02, and 5747.51, to enact sections 122.076, 2308.01, 2308.02, 2308.03, 2308.04, 2329.071, 2329.152, 2329.153, 2329.154, 2329.211, 2329.311, 2329.312, 3701.981, 4141.251, 5302.31, 5721.372, and 5721.373, and to repeal sections 324.01, 324.02, 324.021, 324.03, 324.04, 324.05, 324.06, 324.07, 324.08, 324.09, 324.10, 324.11, 324.12, and 324.99 of the Revised Code, to amend Sections 207.190, 223.10, 229.10, 245.10, 251.10, 257.10, 257.20, 263.50, 263.220, 263.390, 275.10, 305.10, 305.30, 305.53, 305.120, 309.10, and 379.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 64 of the 131st General Assembly, to amend Sections 263.10 and 371.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 64 of the 131st General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to amend Sections 253.120, 273.10, 273.30, and 287.10 of Am. Sub. S.B. 260 of the 131st General Assembly, and to amend Sections 203.10, 207.10, 207.80, 207.90, 207.100, 207.220, 207.240, 207.280, 207.290, 221.10, and 239.10 of S.B. 310 of the 131st General Assembly, and to repeal Section 9 of Sub. H.B. 238 of the 131st General Assembly to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of state programs and to make appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts sales of natural gas from sales tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-28 Effective 9/28/16 - Certain provisions effective on other dates.
2016-05-25HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2016-05-25SenatePassed
2016-05-25SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2016-04-12SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2016-02-29SenateIntroduced
2016-02-24HousePassed
2016-01-27HouseReported - Amended: Ways and Means
2015-11-16HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2015-11-05HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
103Amended CodeCitation Text
10371Amended CodeCitation Text
10374Amended CodeCitation Text
120Amended CodeCitation Text
12033Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
122076New CodeSee Bill Text
122171Amended CodeCitation Text
12285Amended CodeCitation Text
124Amended CodeCitation Text
124152Amended CodeCitation Text
124181Amended CodeCitation Text
124382Amended CodeCitation Text
126Amended CodeCitation Text
12632Amended CodeCitation Text
127Amended CodeCitation Text
12719Amended CodeCitation Text
181Amended CodeCitation Text
18122Amended CodeCitation Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1303Amended CodeCitation Text
130338Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2303Amended CodeCitation Text
230326Amended CodeCitation Text
2308New CodeSee Bill Text
230801New CodeSee Bill Text
230802New CodeSee Bill Text
230803New CodeSee Bill Text
230804New CodeSee Bill Text
2327Amended CodeCitation Text
232701Amended CodeCitation Text
232702Amended CodeCitation Text
232704Amended CodeCitation Text
2329Amended CodeCitation Text
232901Amended CodeCitation Text
2329071New CodeSee Bill Text
2329151Amended CodeCitation Text
2329152New CodeSee Bill Text
2329153New CodeSee Bill Text
2329154New CodeSee Bill Text
232917Amended CodeCitation Text
232918Amended CodeCitation Text
232919Amended CodeCitation Text
232920Amended CodeCitation Text
232921Amended CodeCitation Text
2329211New CodeSee Bill Text
232926Amended CodeCitation Text
2329271Amended CodeCitation Text
232928Amended CodeCitation Text
232930Amended CodeCitation Text
232931Amended CodeCitation Text
2329311New CodeSee Bill Text
2329312New CodeSee Bill Text
232933Amended CodeCitation Text
232934Amended CodeCitation Text
232939Amended CodeCitation Text
232945Amended CodeCitation Text
232952Amended CodeCitation Text
232956Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2909Amended CodeCitation Text
290907Amended CodeCitation Text
2941Amended CodeCitation Text
294151Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
301Amended CodeCitation Text
30128Amended CodeCitation Text
305Amended CodeCitation Text
30531Amended CodeCitation Text
30542Amended CodeCitation Text
323Amended CodeCitation Text
32347Amended CodeCitation Text
32373Amended CodeCitation Text
324Repealed CodeCitation Text
32401Repealed CodeCitation Text
32402Repealed CodeCitation Text
324021Repealed CodeCitation Text
32403Repealed CodeCitation Text
32404Repealed CodeCitation Text
32405Repealed CodeCitation Text
32406Repealed CodeCitation Text
32407Repealed CodeCitation Text
32408Repealed CodeCitation Text
32409Repealed CodeCitation Text
32410Repealed CodeCitation Text
32411Repealed CodeCitation Text
32412Repealed CodeCitation Text
32499Repealed CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3316Amended CodeCitation Text
3316042Amended CodeCitation Text
3375Amended CodeCitation Text
3375404Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3701New CodeSee Bill Text
3701981New CodeSee Bill Text
3702Amended CodeCitation Text
3702511Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4141Amended CodeCitation Text
414125Amended CodeCitation Text
4141251New CodeSee Bill Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4741Amended CodeCitation Text
474111Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5145Amended CodeCitation Text
5145162Amended CodeCitation Text
53Amended CodeCitation Text
5302Amended CodeCitation Text
530201Amended CodeCitation Text
530231New CodeSee Bill Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5537Amended CodeCitation Text
553702Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5721Amended CodeCitation Text
5721371Amended CodeCitation Text
5721372New CodeSee Bill Text
5721373New CodeSee Bill Text
572139Amended CodeCitation Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
573901Amended CodeCitation Text
573902Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574751Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA131-HB-390
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb390/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb390/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb390/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb390/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb390/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb390/CH/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb390/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA131-HB-390

Bill Comments

feedback