OH HB390 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-22)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2933.82 of the Revised Code to require governmental evidence-retention entities to secure and test sexual assault examination kits in relation to an investigation or prosecution of trafficking in persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require sex assault exam kits for trafficking in persons cases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2022-04-05SenateIntroduced
2022-03-30HousePassed
2022-03-28HouseReported: Criminal Justice
2021-09-21HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-08-18HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
293382Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-390
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb390/IN/00/hb390_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb390/RH/01/hb390_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb390/PH/02/hb390_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17650&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18375&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18740&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18757&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18808&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19045&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-390

Bill Comments

feedback