OH HB387 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-28 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-28 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 505.60 and to enact section 307.093 of the Revised Code to authorize a board of county commissioners of any county to enter into agreements for the sale and leaseback of all or portions of county buildings, and to authorize a township to reimburse an officer or employee for out-of-pocket premiums attributable to insurance coverage provided for the immediate dependents of the officer or employee.
Title
To authorize a board of county commissioners of any county to enter into agreements for the sale and leaseback of all or portions of county buildings, and to authorize a township to reimburse an officer or employee for out-of-pocket premiums attributable to insurance coverage provided for the immediate dependents of the officer or employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-11-27 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-28 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2012-11-28 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-11-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-12-01 | To Local Government | |
2011-12-01 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
3 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 07 | 093 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
5 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
5 | 05 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |