OH HB377 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/27/22 - Appropriations effective June 28, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/27/22 - Appropriations effective June 28, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 124.81, 145.012, and 505.60 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 220.11 of H.B. 168 of the 134th General Assembly, Section 5 of H.B. 175 of the 134th General Assembly, Section 7 of S.B. 9 of the 134th General Assembly, and Section 7 of S.B. 11 of the 134th General Assembly to establish the Appalachian Community Grant Program, to specify certain election workers are excluded from PERS membership, expand the category of first responders of certain townships who are considered part-time for health coverage purposes, convey state-owned land, correct an outdated reference to state treasury warrants, and to make appropriations.
Title
Regards coronavirus local fiscal recovery appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective 9/27/22 - Appropriations effective June 28, 2022 | |
2022-06-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Informally passed |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-05-18 | House | Passed |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2021-09-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2021-07-15 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 24 | 81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 45 | 012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 05 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |