OH HB376 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Re-referred: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 1345.51 and to enact sections 1355.01, 1355.02, 1355.03, 1355.04, 1355.05, 1355.06, 1355.07, 1355.08, 1355.09, 1355.10, and 1355.11 of the Revised Code to enact the Ohio Personal Privacy Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Ohio Personal Privacy Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-22HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2022-02-16HouseInformally passed
2022-02-09HouseReported - Substitute: Government Oversight
2021-09-16HouseRefer to Committee: Government Oversight
2021-07-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
134551Amended CodeCitation Text
135501New CodeSee Bill Text
135502New CodeSee Bill Text
135503New CodeSee Bill Text
135504New CodeSee Bill Text
135505New CodeSee Bill Text
135506New CodeSee Bill Text
135507New CodeSee Bill Text
135508New CodeSee Bill Text
135509New CodeSee Bill Text
135510New CodeSee Bill Text
135511New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-376
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb376/IN/00/hb376_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb376/RH/01/hb376_01_RH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17485&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17699&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18021&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18042&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18324&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18343&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-376

Bill Comments

feedback