OH HB370 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-25)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5.04 and 5.10 of the Revised Code to add a representation of the Wright Brothers' first piloted airplane to the Coat of Arms and Great Seal of the State of Ohio.
Title
Add depiction of Wright flyer to state seal and coat of arms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed |
2017-12-13 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-10-02 | House | Introduced |