OH HB37 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Effective 6/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Effective 6/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4729.281 and 4729.283 and to enact section 3902.62 of the Revised Code regarding emergency prescription refills.
Title
Regards emergency prescription refills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Effective 6/1/22 | |
2022-02-16 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Health |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2021-02-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 02 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 29 | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 283 | Amended Code | Citation Text |