OH HB349 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2921.321 and 2929.18 of the Revised Code to include search and rescue dogs and horses in the prohibition against assaulting or harassing a police animal.
Title
Increase and expand crime of assaulting a police animal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-27 | House | Passed |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2017-10-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-09-19 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture : Animals
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 21 | 321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |