OH HB346 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-09-12 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-09-12 - Effective Date
Summary
To enact sections 3727.50 to 3727.57 of the Revised Code regarding hospital staffing guidelines for registered nurses and licensed practical nurses.
Title
Hospital staffing guidelines-registered nurses
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hughes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-12 | Effective Date | |
2008-06-12 | Governor Action | |
2008-06-17 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-06-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-05-28 | Concurrence | |
2008-05-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-05-21 | Committee Report | |
2008-03-13 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2008-03-13 | Introduced to Senate | |
2008-03-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-02-07 | Committee Report | |
2007-10-09 | To Health | |
2007-10-09 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_346 |