OH HB343 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5709.17 and 5715.19 of the Revised Code to limit the authority of local governments to initiate property tax valuation complaints against residential property, to require local governments to formally pass a resolution before initiating a complaint against any type of property, to limit the authority of a school district to file counter-complaints, and to expand the existing property tax exemption for fraternal organizations to include the property of such organizations with longstanding national governing bodies.
Title
Regards how local governments are to contest property values
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed |
2018-01-16 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2017-09-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2017-09-11 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 09 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 15 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |