OH HB342 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 133.18, 306.32, 306.322, 345.01, 345.03, 345.04, 505.48, 505.481, 511.27, 511.28, 511.34, 1545.041, 1545.21, 3311.50, 3318.01, 3318.06, 3318.061, 3318.062, 3318.063, 3318.361, 3318.45, 3381.03, 4582.024, 4582.26, 5705.01, 5705.03, 5705.192, 5705.195, 5705.196, 5705.197, 5705.199, 5705.21, 5705.213, 5705.215, 5705.218, 5705.219, 5705.233, 5705.25, 5705.251, 5705.261, 5705.55, 5748.01, 5748.02, 5748.03, 5748.04, 5748.08, and 5748.09 of the Revised Code to modify the information conveyed in election notices and ballot language for property tax levies.
Title
Regards timing and content of tax ballot issues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-20 | House | Passed |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-09-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-09-11 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Elections
Liquor Control : Local Option Elections
State and Local Government : Local Government
Taxation
Liquor Control : Local Option Elections
State and Local Government : Local Government
Taxation